NC S473 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Hearing: Jun 22 @ 3:00 pm in 1228/1327 LB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Enhance Local Gov't Transparency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance Local Gov't Transparency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-10HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-10HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-06SenateEngrossed
2021-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-06SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-27SenateRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2021-04-27SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-21SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-19SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-01SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback