NC S47 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Ch. SL 2020-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Ch. SL 2020-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Morganton Firemen's Relief Fund
Title
Morganton Firemen's Relief Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Ch. SL 2020-8 | |
2020-06-08 | Ratified | |
2020-06-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-03 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2020-06-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |