NC S467 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Support for USMCA
Title
Support for USMCA
Sponsors
Sen. William Jackson [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-26 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-06-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Filed |