NC S453 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Modernize ABC Controls

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernize ABC Controls

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-13SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2021-05-12SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-13SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-05SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-05SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-01SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback