NC S450 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-13 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-13 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various Education Changes
Title
Various Education Changes
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Lee [R] | Sen. Deanna Ballard [R] | Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] |
Sen. David Craven [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 92 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-07-13 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-06-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-07 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Alarm Systems
Boards
Buildings
Charter Schools
Education
Educational Testing
Elementary Education
Hazardous Substances
Infrastructure
Private Schools
Public
Safety
Safety Equipment
School Buildings
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Surveys & Polls
Testing
Title Change
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Boards
Buildings
Charter Schools
Education
Educational Testing
Elementary Education
Hazardous Substances
Infrastructure
Private Schools
Public
Safety
Safety Equipment
School Buildings
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Surveys & Polls
Testing
Title Change
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 549 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 557 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 562.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160A | 330 | (n/a) | Citation Text |