NC S448 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Ch. SL 2022-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-14 - Ch. SL 2022-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Schedule VI of the CSA
Title
Amendments to Schedule VI of the CSA
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Burgin [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Ch. SL 2022-9 | |
2022-06-14 | Signed by Gov. 6/14/2022 | |
2022-06-10 | Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2022 | |
2022-06-09 | Ratified | |
2022-06-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-08 | House | Amendment Ruled Out of Order A1 |
2022-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2022 |
2022-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2022 |
2022-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/02/2022 |
2022-06-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary 3 |
2022-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2022-06-01 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary 4 Stricken |
2022-06-01 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary 2 Stricken |
2021-06-17 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Judiciary 2, if favorable, Judiciary 3, if favorable, Judiciary 4 |
2021-06-17 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2021 |
2021-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-03 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/03/2021 |
2021-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/10/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commissions
Controlled Substances
Disabled Persons
Health Services
Mental Health
Mhddsas Comn.
Pharmaceuticals
Presented
Public
Ratified
Substance Abuse
Commissions
Controlled Substances
Disabled Persons
Health Services
Mental Health
Mhddsas Comn.
Pharmaceuticals
Presented
Public
Ratified
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 94 | (n/a) | Citation Text |