NC S448 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amend Appt For Compact on Education/Military

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Appt For Compact on Education/Military

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21 Ch. SL 2019-38
2019-06-21 Signed by Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-14 Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019
2019-06-13 Ratified
2019-06-12HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-10HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2019
2019-06-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-05HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-05HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-20HouseRe-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H340 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback