NC S432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Conf Report Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Birth Center & Pharm Benefits Mgr. Licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Birth Center & Pharm Benefits Mgr. Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-10-23 - House - A1 Pittman M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - A1 Pittman Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 85 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-10-23 - House - A2 Floyd Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-10-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-26SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-15HouseConferees Changed
2020-06-10SenateConferees Reappointed
2020-06-10SenateConf Com Dismissed
2019-11-13HouseConferees Changed
2019-10-30HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-29SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-10-29SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-10-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/29/2019
2019-10-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-28SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-10-24HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-23HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-23HouseAmend Failed A2
2019-10-23HouseAmend Failed A1
2019-10-22HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-22HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-22HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-09-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-08-13HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-08-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-12HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-08-12HouseSerial Referral To Finance Added
2019-08-12HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2019-08-08HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-22HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-04-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-03SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-01SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-01SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H179 (Same As) 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-34

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S432
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S432v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S432v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S432v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S432v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S432v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/111
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/849
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/854
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/853
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/852
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/851
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/627
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/886

Bill Comments

feedback