NC S429 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Comm. Receivership and Real Property Amends
Title
Comm. Receivership and Real Property Amends
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Commerce
Corporations
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
For-profit
Notary Public
Property
Public
Public Records
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Rentals & Leasing
Sales & Conveyances
Session Laws
Commerce
Corporations
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
For-profit
Notary Public
Property
Public
Public Records
Real Estate
Recordation Of Instruments
Records
Rentals & Leasing
Sales & Conveyances
Session Laws
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
1 | 502 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 507.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 507.24 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 507.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 507.40 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
1 | 507.42 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
10B | 65 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 69 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 71 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
10B | 72 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
41 | 56 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | 75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
46A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
46A | 28 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
47 | 108.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 108.20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 108.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 2.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 48 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 51 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 53.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 72 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 97 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
47 | 97.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
53C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
53C | 9-401 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
93A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
93A | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text |