NC S426 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Barber Apprentice Changes
Title
Barber Apprentice Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed |