NC S42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduce Cost & Reg. Burden/Hosp. Construction
Title
Reduce Cost & Reg. Burden/Hosp. Construction
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Louis Pate [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-174 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken |
2017-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/15/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/14/2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed |