NC S417 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
NC National Guard/Courts-Martial
Title
NC National Guard/Courts-Martial
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H511 (Same As) 2020-06-26 - Ch. SL 2020-47
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S417 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S417v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S417v1.pdf |