NC S415 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarify Def'n. of Collection Agency
Title
Clarify Def'n. of Collection Agency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-149 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Filed |