NC S391 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ferry Transportation Authority
Title
Ferry Transportation Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Ch. SL 2017-120 | |
2017-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed |