NC S389 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Ch. SL 2021-158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

DEQ/DNCR Omnibus.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEQ/DNCR Omnibus.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-16 Ch. SL 2021-158
2021-09-16 Signed by Gov. 9/16/2021
2021-09-08 Pres. To Gov. 9/8/2021
2021-09-08 Ratified
2021-09-08SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-08SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-09-03SenatePlaced On Cal For 09/08/2021
2021-09-03SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-09-02HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-09-01HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-09-01HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-01HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-01HouseAmend Adopted A2
2021-09-01HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-09-01HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-09-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-09-01HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-31HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-08-31HouseReptd Fav
2021-08-24HouseRe-ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-08-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-08-23HouseRe-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-08-23HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-27HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-26HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-04-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-21SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-01SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-29SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S389
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S389v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52958/0/S389-PCS15331-BR-24
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52965/0/S389-ABR-61-V-3
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52967/0/S389-A-NBC-9153
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-28(e1)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-32(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-68(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-70(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-71(e2)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-72(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-85(sl)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-86(sl)-v-6
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-87(sl)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-88(sl)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-89(sl)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-90(sl)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-91(sl)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-92(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-93(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-94(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-95(sl)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-96(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S389-SMBR-97(sl)-v-3
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/99
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/515
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/443

Bill Comments

feedback