NC S388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Ch. SL 2022-45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Qualifying Farmer Zoo Sales Tax Exemption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualifying Farmer Zoo Sales Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-07-07 Ch. SL 2022-45
2022-07-07 Signed by Gov. 7/7/2022
2022-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2022
2022-06-30 Ratified
2022-06-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2022-06-29SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2022-06-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2022
2022-06-28SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2022-06-28HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2022-06-28HousePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2022-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2022-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2022-06-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-28HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2022-06-27HouseCorrected Copy Committee Substitute Ordered
2022-06-22HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2022-06-22HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2022-06-14HouseRe-ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-14HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-09-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-09-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-09-09HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-09-09SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-09-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-08SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-07SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-31SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-31SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-19SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-29SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105(n/a)Citation Text
105164.13E(n/a)Citation Text
105164.13F(n/a)Citation Text
105277.15(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S388
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S388v8.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52941/0/S388-PCS15329-RBf-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54885/0/S388-PCS45588-TQf-47
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54930/0/S388-PCS35415-TQf-47
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54957/0/S388-PCS15455-SVf-41
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/54986/0/S388-PCS45594-TQf-50
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMRB-28(CSRBf-14)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMRB-30(e2)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMTQ-138(CSTQf-47)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMBR-144(e5)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMSV-118(CSSVf-41)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMSV-122(e5)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMSV-125(e6)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMSV-132(sl)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S388-SMSV-132(sl)-v-5
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/444
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/691
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/649

Bill Comments

feedback