NC S384 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal Law Changes
Title
Criminal Law Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 85 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A8 Morey Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A7 McNeill Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A6 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A5 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A4 Pierce Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A3 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - A2 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A8 Morey Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A7 McNeill Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A6 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A5 Dollar Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A4 Pierce Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A3 Jackson Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 59 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - A2 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-176 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2017-06-30 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-29 | House | Amend Adopted A8 |
2017-06-29 | House | Amend Adopted A7 |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A6 |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A5 |
2017-06-28 | House | Reconsidered 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H466 (Same As) 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-116