NC S380 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
Summary
Collection of Data/DMV Reports.
Title
Collection of Data/DMV Reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Reconsidered 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-24 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-03-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-04 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S380 |