NC S38 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sports Wagering Amendments
Title
Sports Wagering Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Michael Lazzara [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] |
Sen. Benjamin Clark [D] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] | Sen. Vickie Sawyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - A1 Hall, K. Second Reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A2 John Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A3 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A4 Autry Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 50 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A2 John Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A3 Cunningham Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - A4 Autry Second Reading (Y: 61 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 50 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-22 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2022-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A5 |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2022-06-22 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2022-06-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-21 | House | Ruled Material |
2022-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-06-20 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2022-06-20 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2022-06-20 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2022-06-09 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Attorneys
Civil Actions
Commerce
Commissions
Corporate Income
Corporations
Courts
Criminal Records
Employment
Fees
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Licenses & Permits
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Nonprofit
Occupations
Personnel
Privilege
Public
Racing
Records
Reports
Revenue Dept.
Session Laws
Small Business
Sports
Studies
Surety & Fidelity
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Title Change
Civil Actions
Commerce
Commissions
Corporate Income
Corporations
Courts
Criminal Records
Employment
Fees
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Gaming
Licenses & Permits
Lottery
Lottery Comn.
Nonprofit
Occupations
Personnel
Privilege
Public
Racing
Records
Reports
Revenue Dept.
Session Laws
Small Business
Sports
Studies
Surety & Fidelity
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Title Change