NC S379 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Ch. SL 2021-126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Issuance of Unregisterable Cert. of Title
Title
Issuance of Unregisterable Cert. of Title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-30 | Ch. SL 2021-126 | |
2021-08-30 | Signed by Gov. 8/30/2021 | |
2021-08-26 | Pres. To Gov. 8/26/2021 | |
2021-08-25 | Ratified | |
2021-08-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-24 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-17 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Dmv
Insurance
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Records
Titles
Transportation Dept.
Unregulated Vehicles
Dmv
Insurance
Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Presented
Public
Ratified
Records
Titles
Transportation Dept.
Unregulated Vehicles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 109.1A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 52.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |