NC S375 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
CADC Supervision Reqs
Title
CADC Supervision Reqs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Addictions Specialist Board
Boards
Counseling
Employment
Health Services
Licensing & Certification
Mental Health
Occupations
Public
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Boards
Counseling
Employment
Health Services
Licensing & Certification
Mental Health
Occupations
Public
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 113.31A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 113.37A | (n/a) | Citation Text |