NC S371 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Building Code Regulatory Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Code Regulatory Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-10SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H252 (Same As) 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-130

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback