NC S363 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Wage & Hour/Local Gov't Assessments
Title
Wage & Hour/Local Gov't Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 82 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2016 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2016-06-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016 |
2016-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016 |
2016-06-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2016-05-31 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-05-31 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-25 | House | Ruled Material |
2016-05-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-05-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H440 (Same As) 2015-04-02 - Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform