NC S360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Collusive Settlements by the AG
Title
Prohibit Collusive Settlements by the AG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 58 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-09-27 | Vetoed 09/27/2021 | |
2021-09-17 | Pres. To Gov. 9/17/2021 | |
2021-09-16 | Ratified | |
2021-09-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-09-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-09-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/15/2021 |
2021-09-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-09-08 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-09-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Council Of State
Courts
General Assembly
Judgments
Justice Dept.
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Speaker
Vetoed
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Council Of State
Courts
General Assembly
Judgments
Justice Dept.
Presented
President Pro Tempore
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Speaker
Vetoed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
114 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
114 | 2.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
114 | 2.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |