NC S359 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - Veto Override (Y: 67 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Motion 11 Override Veto (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 65 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseFailed To Override Veto
2019-05-29HousePlaced On Cal For 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-22HousePlaced On Cal For 05/29/2019
2019-05-22HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-20HousePlaced On Cal For 05/22/2019
2019-05-20HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-16HousePlaced On Cal For 05/20/2019
2019-05-16HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-15HousePlaced On Cal For 05/16/2019
2019-05-15HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-07HousePlaced On Cal For 05/15/2019
2019-05-07HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-03HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-03HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-30HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-04-30HouseVeto Received from Senate
2019-04-30SenateVeto Overridden
2019-04-29SenatePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18 Vetoed 04/18/2019
2019-04-16 Pres. To Gov. 4/16/2019
2019-04-16 Ratified
2019-04-16HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2019-04-15SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-04-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-10SenateSequential Referral To Health Care Stricken
2019-04-08SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-27SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H602 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback