NC S350 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LME/MCO Claims Reporting/Mental Health Amdts
Title
LME/MCO Claims Reporting/Mental Health Amdts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2017-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2017-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Filed |