NC S344 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Combine Adult Correction & Juvenile Justice
Title
Combine Adult Correction & Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A3 McNeill Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A2 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - A3 McNeill Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A2 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Turner, R. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Ch. SL 2017-186 | |
2017-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Concurred In H Amend S344v1 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend |
2017-06-29 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-29 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2017-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed |