NC S343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legal Notices/Newsprint Employees
Title
Legal Notices/Newsprint Employees
Sponsors
Sen. Trudy Wade [R] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] | Sen. James Bishop [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] |
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Amend Tabled A1 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H432 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Finance