NC S342 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Motor Vehicle Franchise Laws
Title
Clarify Motor Vehicle Franchise Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H403 (Same As) 2021-09-10 - Ch. SL 2021-147
H649 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
H649 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 286 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 305 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 305.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |