NC S336 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Regular Message Sent To Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Condo Act/Restitut'n/Market.Title Act Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condo Act/Restitut'n/Market.Title Act Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-10-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-10-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-10-20HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-10-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-10-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-10-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-10-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-09-29HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-09-29HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-13HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-06SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-04SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-23SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14190.17B(n/a)Citation Text
47A2(n/a)Citation Text
47B3(n/a)Citation Text
47C(n/a)Citation Text
47C1-102(n/a)Citation Text
47C2-101(n/a)Citation Text
47C2-105(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S336
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S336v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S336v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S336v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S336v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53202/0/S336-PCS15337-TG-40
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53213/0/S336-PCS15339-MV-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S336-SMTG-55(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S336-SMTG-60(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S336-SMTG-123(CSTG-40)-v-10
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S336-SMTG-124(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S336-SMTG-126(e3)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/182
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/550

Bill Comments

feedback