NC S336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Smart Start Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smart Start Funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-26SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-25SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H124 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback