NC S329 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Ch. SL 2021-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on December 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Ch. SL 2021-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bldg. Permit Exempt./Timeshare Eff. Date
Title
Bldg. Permit Exempt./Timeshare Eff. Date
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Jarvis [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Jim Burgin [R] |
Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - House - A1 Farkas Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 91 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - House - A1 Farkas Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Ch. SL 2021-192 | |
2021-12-09 | Signed by Gov. 12/9/2021 | |
2021-12-01 | Pres. To Gov. 12/1/2021 | |
2021-11-30 | Ratified | |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2021-11-16 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 11/04/2021 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-10-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-10-20 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-10-20 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-10-20 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-10-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2021-08-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-16 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Architects & Architecture
Building Codes
Buildings
Chaptered
Construction
Construction Industry
Definitions
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Occupations
Presented
Public
Ratified
Session Laws
Title Change
Building Codes
Buildings
Chaptered
Construction
Construction Industry
Definitions
Licenses & Permits
Local Government
Occupations
Presented
Public
Ratified
Session Laws
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 138 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160D | 1104 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
160D | 1110 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
83A | 13 | (n/a) | Citation Text |