NC S326 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on December 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election Day Integrity Act
Title
Election Day Integrity Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-12-02 | Vetoed 12/02/2021 | |
2021-11-22 | Pres. To Gov. 11/22/2021 | |
2021-11-22 | Ratified | |
2021-11-18 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/18/2021 |
2021-11-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-21 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-17 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Ballots & Ballot Issues
Boards
Budgeting
Counties
Elections
Elections Boards
Id Systems
Local Government
Political Parties
Presented
Primaries
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Reporting
State Board Of
Title Change
Vetoed
Ballots & Ballot Issues
Boards
Budgeting
Counties
Elections
Elections Boards
Id Systems
Local Government
Political Parties
Presented
Primaries
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Reporting
State Board Of
Title Change
Vetoed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
163 | 227.10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 230.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 231 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 232.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 232.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 234 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
163 | 89 | (n/a) | Citation Text |