NC S320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regional Water Systems and State Grants
Title
Regional Water Systems and State Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-22 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 23 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-07-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading (Y: 55 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-07-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 64 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-02 | Vetoed 08/02/2019 | |
2019-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019 | |
2019-07-23 | Ratified | |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2019 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/15/2019 |
2019-07-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H414 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House