NC S315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Conf Rpt Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

North Carolina Farm Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Carolina Farm Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-01 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-08-21 - House - A1 John Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - A2 Harrison Second Reading (Y: 51 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-21 - House - A3 McNeely Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - A4 Howard Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - A5 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - House - A6 Alexander Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 64 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-21 - House - A7 Montgomery Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 77 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-08-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Motion 11 Divide Question (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29HouseConf Rpt Withdrawn
2019-10-29HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-28SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-10-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-24HousePlaced On Cal For 10/28/2019
2019-10-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-10-24HouseConf Com Reported
2019-10-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/28/2019
2019-10-24SenateConf Com Reported
2019-10-08HouseConferees Changed
2019-10-07HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-10-03SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-10-01SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-10-01SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-10-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-10-01SenateRe-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2019-10-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-22SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-08-21HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-08-21HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-08-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-21HouseAmend Failed A7
2019-08-21HouseAmend Failed A6
2019-08-21HouseAmend Adopted A5
2019-08-21HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-08-21HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-08-21HouseAmend Failed A2
2019-08-21HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-20HousePlaced On Cal For 08/21/2019
2019-08-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 4
2019-07-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-07-17HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-07-17HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-07-01HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-07-01HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-19HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-18HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-06-18SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-17SenateEngrossed
2019-06-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17SenateAmend Failed A3
2019-06-17SenateAmend Tabled A2
2019-06-17SenateMotion to Divide Question Failed
2019-06-17SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2019
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-12SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-10SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-10SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-06SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-06SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-06SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-17SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-20SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S315
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v8.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v9.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S315v10.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/308
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/307
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/306
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/305
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/304
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/778
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/777
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/776
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/775
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/774
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/773
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/772
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/771
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/598
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/626

Bill Comments

feedback