NC S315 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Ch. SL 2013-386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal Services
Title
Municipal Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-26 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A4 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A3 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A2 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Luebke Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - House - M8 Re-Refer Finance (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-07-25 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A4 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A3 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - House - A2 Hall, L. M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 73 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - A1 Luebke Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - House - M8 Re-Refer Finance (Y: 75 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | Ch. SL 2013-386 | |
2013-08-23 | Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2013 | |
2013-07-26 | Ratified | |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-26 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013 |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/24/2013 |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2013 |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/18/2013 |
2013-07-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013 |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2013 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/15/2013 |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/11/2013 |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Rec To Concur H Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-08 | House | Amend Tabled A4 |
2013-07-08 | House | Amend Tabled A3 |
2013-07-08 | House | Amend Tabled A2 |
2013-06-27 | House | Postponed To 07/08/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-06-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-06-12 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-06-12 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-06-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed |