NC S312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Relief to Ocracoke School/Hurricane Dorian

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief to Ocracoke School/Hurricane Dorian

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-17SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-10-10HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-10-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-10-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-10-09HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-10-09HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-10-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-07SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-06SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-01SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-18SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19SenateFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback