NC S312 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Ch. SL 2017-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Surplus Computers for Low-Income Students
Title
Surplus Computers for Low-Income Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Ch. SL 2017-67 | |
2017-06-28 | Signed by Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2017 | |
2017-06-19 | Ratified | |
2017-06-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H254 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations