NC S308 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Ch. SL 2021-183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Various Building Code Amend

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Building Code Amend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 95 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-10-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23 Ch. SL 2021-183
2021-11-23 Signed by Gov. 11/23/2021
2021-11-18 Pres. To Gov. 11/18/2021
2021-11-17 Ratified
2021-11-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-11-16SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-11-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 11/16/2021
2021-11-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-11-04SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-11-04SenateConf Com Reported
2021-11-04HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-11-04HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-11-04HouseConf Com Reported
2021-11-03HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-11-03SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-11-02SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2021-11-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 11/02/2021
2021-11-01SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-10-25SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-10-25SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-10-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-10-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-10-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-10-20HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-10-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-10-20HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-04-08HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-05HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-04-05SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-01SenateEngrossed
2021-04-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-01SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-03-31SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-30SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-30SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-03-30SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-18SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-18SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-16SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
143136(n/a)Citation Text
143143.2(n/a)Citation Text
150B19(n/a)Citation Text
150B21.3(n/a)Citation Text
160D(n/a)Citation Text
160D1104(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S308
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S308v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2027/0/S308-PCS15187-CC-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/2300/0/S308-ARI-8-V-2
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53215/0/S308-PCS45465-BG-26
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53423/0/S308-PCCS45467-ST-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMCC-4(e1)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMCC-6(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMBG-68(CSBG-25)-v-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMBG-69(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMBG-76(sl)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S308-SMBG-76(sl)-v-5
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/80
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/79
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/549
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/488
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/568
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/508

Bill Comments

feedback