NC S301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - Ch. SL 2021-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-26 - Ch. SL 2021-118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expand Expunction Eligibility
Title
Expand Expunction Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Ch. SL 2021-118 | |
2021-08-26 | Signed by Gov. 8/26/2021 | |
2021-08-20 | Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2021 | |
2021-08-19 | Ratified | |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/18/2021 |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/11/2021 |
2021-08-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-08-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-07-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-07-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-28 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 03/30/2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Aoc
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Records
Definitions
Judicial Dept.
Presented
Privacy
Public
Ratified
Records
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Records
Definitions
Judicial Dept.
Presented
Privacy
Public
Ratified
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
15A | 145.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 145.8A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 151 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
15A | 151.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text |