NC S300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-02 - Ch. SL 2021-138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Justice Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-18 - House - A2 Morey Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-02 Ch. SL 2021-138
2021-09-02 Signed by Gov. 9/2/2021
2021-08-26 Pres. To Gov. 8/26/2021
2021-08-25 Ratified
2021-08-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-08-24SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2021-08-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/24/2021
2021-08-23SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-08-19HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-08-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-18HouseAmend Failed A2
2021-08-18HouseAmend Failed A1
2021-08-18HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-08-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-07-14HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-07-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-28HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-28HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-24HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12HouseSpecial Message Received From Senate
2021-05-12SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-05-12SenateEngrossed
2021-05-12SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-12SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-12SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-11SenateReptd Fav
2021-05-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-05-07SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-05-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-17SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-17SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-15SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
108D1(n/a)Citation Text
12019(n/a)Citation Text
12019.1(n/a)Citation Text
12019.4(n/a)Citation Text
1203.1(n/a)Citation Text
122C(n/a)Citation Text
122C251(n/a)Citation Text
1321.4A(n/a)Citation Text
1385(n/a)Citation Text
14(n/a)Citation Text
14208.39(n/a)Citation Text
14208.40(n/a)Citation Text
14208.40A(n/a)Citation Text
14208.40B(n/a)Citation Text
14208.41(n/a)Citation Text
14208.42(n/a)Citation Text
14208.43(n/a)Citation Text
14208.6(n/a)Citation Text
14223(n/a)Citation Text
144(n/a)Citation Text
143B(n/a)Citation Text
143B919(n/a)Citation Text
143B972.1(n/a)Citation Text
150B(n/a)Citation Text
150B1(n/a)Citation Text
150B21.1(n/a)Citation Text
153A(n/a)Citation Text
153A123(n/a)Citation Text
15A(n/a)Citation Text
15A1343(n/a)Citation Text
15A1343.2(n/a)Citation Text
15A1344(n/a)Citation Text
15A1368.4(n/a)Citation Text
15A1374(n/a)Citation Text
15A401(n/a)Citation Text
15A601(n/a)Citation Text
160A(n/a)Citation Text
160A175(n/a)Citation Text
17A10(n/a)Citation Text
17C(n/a)Citation Text
17C10(n/a)Citation Text
17C14(n/a)Citation Text
17C15(n/a)Citation Text
17C16(n/a)Citation Text
17C2(n/a)Citation Text
17C6(n/a)Citation Text
17E(n/a)Citation Text
17E14(n/a)Citation Text
17E15(n/a)Citation Text
17E16(n/a)Citation Text
17E2(n/a)Citation Text
17E4(n/a)Citation Text
17E7(n/a)Citation Text
93B1(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S300
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S300v8.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51310/0/S300-PCS35276-TT-15
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51560/0/S300-PCS15295-TT-20
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51846/0/S300-ATT-60-V-4
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52486/0/S300-PCS45450-SA-31
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52760/0/S300-PCS35323-SA-35
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52767/0/S300-ASA-59-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52768/0/S300-ASA-60-V-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-45(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-46(CSTT-20)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-47(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-48(e3)-v-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-48(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMTT-49(e4)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMSA-60(CSSA-31)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S300-SMSA-67(e6)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/210
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/209
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/482
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/481
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/408

Bill Comments 750

feedback