NC S299 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
NCDOI NAIC Accreditation.-AB
Title
NCDOI NAIC Accreditation.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-17 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Ch. SL 2021-114 | |
2021-08-23 | Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021 | |
2021-08-19 | Pres. To Gov. 8/19/2021 | |
2021-08-18 | Ratified | |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2021-08-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-08-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/11/2021 |
2021-08-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-08-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-08-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-08-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-30 | House | Re-ref Com On State Government |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H150 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Chaptered
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Surety & Fidelity
Council Of State
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Surety & Fidelity
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
58 | 7-21 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
58 | 7-22 | (n/a) | Citation Text |