NC S295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
250th Anniv. Am.Rev/Preserve Hist. Properties
Title
250th Anniv. Am.Rev/Preserve Hist. Properties
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Alexander [R] | Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] | Sen. Kevin Corbin [R] |
Sen. Amy Galey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H463 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Alamance County
Appropriations
Budgeting
Buildings
Chowan County
Corporations
Counties
Cultural Resources
Davie County
Forsyth County
Gibsonville
Guilford County
Historic Preservation
Historic Sites & Monuments
Lakes & Rivers
Local Government
Macon County
Minorities
Municipalities
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Nonprofit
Pender County
Public
Tribes & Tribal Government
Yadkin River
Appropriations
Budgeting
Buildings
Chowan County
Corporations
Counties
Cultural Resources
Davie County
Forsyth County
Gibsonville
Guilford County
Historic Preservation
Historic Sites & Monuments
Lakes & Rivers
Local Government
Macon County
Minorities
Municipalities
Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.
Nonprofit
Pender County
Public
Tribes & Tribal Government
Yadkin River
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S295 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S295v1.pdf |