NC S292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
Pending: House State and Local Government II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
Pending: House State and Local Government II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ord. Violation/No Auto Misdemeanor
Title
Ord. Violation/No Auto Misdemeanor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, State and Local Government II |
2017-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Filed |