NC S290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-06 - Re-ref Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-06 - Re-ref Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Early Refills of Prescription Eye Drops
Title
Allow Early Refills of Prescription Eye Drops
Sponsors
Sen. David Curtis [R] | Sen. Andrew Brock [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] | Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] | Sen. James Woodard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed |