NC S29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Move Over Law/Increase Penalties/Amber Lights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Move Over Law/Increase Penalties/Amber Lights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10SenateConcurred In H Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-09HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-08HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-08HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-01HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-06-28HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-28HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Transportation Stricken
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Finance Stricken
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2019-02-26HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Matters, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-25HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-02-25SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-02-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-02-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-02-20SenateReptd Fav
2019-02-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-02-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-07SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H81 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee on Criminal Matters, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback