NC S289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Ch. SL 2017-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Ch. SL 2017-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Deannexations
Title
Various Deannexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Graham, G. Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-06-28 - House - Third Reading (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - A1 Graham, G. Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 68 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Ch. SL 2017-85 | |
2017-06-30 | Ratified | |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Dismissed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Ruled Material |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-05-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Filed |