NC S289 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Ch. SL 2011-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cape Carteret Deannexation
Title
Cape Carteret Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Ch. SL 2011-167 | |
2011-06-17 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-15 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-13 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-26 | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-04-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Filed |