NC S279 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-20 - Ch. SL 2015-279
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Qualifications/Practice of Counseling
Title
Amend Qualifications/Practice of Counseling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-09-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - A2 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - A1 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House C RPT Adoption (Y: 66 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-21 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-09-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - A2 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - House - A1 Fisher Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-20 | Ch. SL 2015-279 | |
2015-10-20 | Signed by Gov. 10/20/2015 | |
2015-10-01 | Pres. To Gov. 10/01/2015 | |
2015-09-30 | Ratified | |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-30 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-09-30 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2015-09-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Conf Com Withdrawn/dismi |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/21/2015 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-09-16 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-16 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-09-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-16 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-09-16 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/16/2015 |
2015-09-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-06 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-02 | Engrossed | |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |