NC S273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement System Act
Title
Charlotte Firefighters' Retirement System Act
Sponsors
Sen. Natasha Marcus [D] | Sen. DeAndrea Salvador [D] | Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Jackson [D] |
Sen. Mujtaba Mohammed [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Charlotte
Counties
Emergency Services
Firefighters & Firefighting
Government Employees
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Mecklenburg County
Municipalities
Pension & Retirement Funds
Personnel
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Session Laws
Counties
Emergency Services
Firefighters & Firefighting
Government Employees
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Mecklenburg County
Municipalities
Pension & Retirement Funds
Personnel
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Session Laws